Global Patent Index - EP 1235570 A2

EP 1235570 A2 2002-09-04 - COMBINATIONS OF (S)-2-(BENZYLAMINO-METHYL)-2,3,8,9,-TETRAHYDRO-7H-1,4-DIOXINO(2,3)-E INDOL-8-ONE AND NEUROLEPTICS

Title (en)

COMBINATIONS OF (S)-2-(BENZYLAMINO-METHYL)-2,3,8,9,-TETRAHYDRO-7H-1,4-DIOXINO(2,3)-E INDOL-8-ONE AND NEUROLEPTICS

Title (de)

KOMBINATIONEN VON (S)-2-(BENZYLAMINO-METHYL)-2,3,8,9,-TETRAHYDRO-7H-1,4-DIOXINO (2,3-E) INDOL-8-ONE UND NEUROLEPTIKA

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES COMBINAISONS THERAPEUTIQUES DE (S)-2-(BENZYLAMINO-METHYL)-2,3,8,9,-TETRAHYDRO-7H-1,4-DIOXINO 2,3-E INDOL-8-ONE ET NEUROLEPTIQUES DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT OU A LA PREVENTION DE TROUBLES PSYCHOTIQUES

Publication

EP 1235570 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00982461 A

Priority

  • US 0033060 W
  • US 45860799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141750A2] Therapeutic combinations useful in the treatment or prevention of psychotic disorders, to pharmaceutical compositions containing said combinations, and to their use in the treatment or prophylaxis of prevention disorders are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/40; A61P 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/407 (2006.01); A61K 31/4515 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/5415 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 31/407 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/407 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0141750A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141750 A2 20010614; WO 0141750 A3 20020214; AR 026756 A1 20030226; AU 1949001 A 20010618; AU 784211 B2 20060223; BR 0016168 A 20020820; CA 2396351 A1 20010614; CA 2396351 C 20091110; CN 1230164 C 20051207; CN 1409633 A 20030409; CZ 20021880 A3 20020814; EA 005002 B1 20041028; EA 200200656 A1 20021226; EP 1235570 A2 20020904; HU 0203309 A2 20030128; HU 0203309 A3 20041228; IL 149669 A 20060611; IL 149669 D0 20021110; JP 2003516350 A 20030513; JP 5557409 B2 20140723; KR 100772854 B1 20071102; KR 20030016207 A 20030226; MX PA02005649 A 20040910; NO 20022739 A 20020607; NO 20022739 D0 20020607; NZ 519381 A 20040430; PL 355292 A1 20040405; TW I222864 B 20041101; ZA 200205484 B 20031231

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1045942

2011-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100407

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH LLC

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050104

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020527;LT PAYMENT 20020527;LV PAYMENT 20020527;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020527;SI PAYMENT 20020527