Global Patent Index - EP 1235587 A2

EP 1235587 A2 2002-09-04 - VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S AND AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES COMPRISING ALL-D PEPTIDES

Title (en)

VACCINE FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S AND AMYLOID RELATED DISEASES COMPRISING ALL-D PEPTIDES

Title (de)

IMPFSTOFFE ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER UND AMYLOID VERWANDTEN KRANKHEITEN ENTHALTEND PEPTIDE BESTEHEND NUR AUS D-AMINOSÄUREN

Title (fr)

VACCIN DESTINE A LA PREVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET D'AUTRES MALADIES ASSOCIEES AUX SUBSTANCES AMYLOIDES

Publication

EP 1235587 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00981111 A

Priority

  • CA 0001413 W
  • US 16859499 P
  • US 72484200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139796A2] The present invention relates to a stereochemically based "non-self" antigen vaccine for the prevention and/or treatment of Alzheimer's and other amyloid related diseases. The present invention provides a vaccine for the prevention and treatment of Alzheimer's and other amyloid related diseases, which overcomes the drawbacks associated with using naturally occurring peptides, proteins or immunogens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4711 (2013.01); A61K 39/0007 (2013.01); C07K 16/18 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139796A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139796 A2 20010607; WO 0139796 A3 20011206; AU 1847301 A 20010612; AU 784312 B2 20060309; BR 0016022 A 20020806; CA 2388559 A1 20010607; CN 1433321 A 20030730; EP 1235587 A2 20020904; IL 149924 D0 20021110; JP 2004500354 A 20040108; KR 20080059676 A 20080630; MX PA02005576 A 20021213; NO 20022531 A 20020712; NO 20022531 D0 20020528; NZ 540564 A 20070427

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049279

2009-05-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081118

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BELLUS HEALTH (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEUROCHEM (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEUROCHEM (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI