Global Patent Index - EP 1235634 A1

EP 1235634 A1 2002-09-04 - SOLUTION BASED TWO-DIMENSIONAL SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AMPHOTERIC SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

SOLUTION BASED TWO-DIMENSIONAL SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AMPHOTERIC SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

ZWEIDIMENSIONALE TRENNUNG UND DETEKTION VON IN LÖSUNG BEFINDLICHEN AMPHOTEREN SUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

SEPARATION ET DETECTION BIDIMENSIONNELLES EN SOLUTION DE SUBSTANCES AMPHOTERES

Publication

EP 1235634 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00978541 A

Priority

  • US 0031050 W
  • US 16565999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136071A1] A method and apparatus for separating mixtures of amphoteric substances uses two dimensions of separation. A sample valve (8, 9) is used to introduce a sample into the mobile phase (7b) for entry into the first dimension of separation, typically a chromatography column (10). The separated sample is passed to the second dimension, which is formed by a series of stages (11, 18, 19). The first stage (11) has a manifold having an anode (13), cathode (12) and a membrane (15) of a specific pK, defining two channels (16a, 16b). The amphoteric molecules are segregated between the two channels and the segregated molecules are passed to a second stage, where each channel (16a, 16b) is further split into two channels (16e, 16f and 16c, 16d), respectively. In each subsequent stage (19), the number of channels is doubled from the previous stage, increasing the degree of separation by pH.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 57/02; B01D 59/50; B01D 61/58; C07K 1/28; G01N 27/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 57/02 (2006.01); G01N 27/447 (2006.01); G01N 30/46 (2006.01); G01N 30/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/461 (2013.01); B01D 57/02 (2013.01); G01N 27/44743 (2013.01); G01N 27/44769 (2013.01); G01N 30/02 (2013.01); G01N 30/463 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G01N 30/02 + G01N 27/447

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136071 A1 20010525; AU 1599501 A 20010530; EP 1235634 A1 20020904; EP 1235634 A4 20040901

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070601

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-09-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 57/02 A

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 59/50 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 61/58 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 27/447 B

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/28 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROTEOTOOLS LLC

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAMPAGNE, JAMES T.

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHAMPAGNE, JAMES T.

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHAMPAGNE, JAMES T.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR