Global Patent Index - EP 1235658 A1

EP 1235658 A1 2002-09-04 - ELECTRODE MADE WITH CATALYTIC POWDER

Title (en)

ELECTRODE MADE WITH CATALYTIC POWDER

Title (de)

ELEKTRODE MIT KATALYTISCHEM PULVER HERGESTELLT

Title (fr)

ELECTRODE PRODUITE AVEC POUDRE CATALYTIQUE

Publication

EP 1235658 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00973563 A

Priority

  • US 0028563 W
  • US 16054599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0128714A1] A catalytic powder comprising a plurality of support metal particles with a porous coating (12) surrounding the metal particles (11), the porous coating comprising either an electrocatalytic metal or an electrocatalytic metal continuous phase in admixture with a particulate material (14). An electrode made with the catalytic powder and a method to make the electrode is also disclosed. The present invention is advantageous because the porous coating mixture is first applied to a powder rather than being applied directly to a metal substrate, thereby creating a large internal surface area on the electrode and accordingly, lower overpotential requirements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 1/02; B22F 3/11; C25B 11/03; C25B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 1/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01); C25B 11/03 (2006.01); C25B 11/04 (2006.01); C25B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/03 (2013.01); B22F 1/0096 (2013.01); B22F 1/025 (2013.01); B22F 3/1103 (2013.01); B22F 7/004 (2013.01); C25B 11/0489 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0128714A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0128714 A1 20010426; AU 1206301 A 20010430; BR 0015062 A 20020716; CA 2387563 A1 20010426; CN 1379703 A 20021113; DE 60012363 D1 20040826; DE 60012363 T2 20041209; EP 1235658 A1 20020904; EP 1235658 B1 20040721; JP 2003512520 A 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012363 P 20040826

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRODE MADE WITH CATALYTIC POWDER

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI