Global Patent Index - EP 1235686 A1

EP 1235686 A1 2002-09-04 - INK BAR FOR INK DUCTS IN PRINTING MACHINES

Title (en)

INK BAR FOR INK DUCTS IN PRINTING MACHINES

Title (de)

FARBBALKEN FÜR FARBKÄSTEN IN DRUCKMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

BARRE ENCREUSE POUR RESERVOIRS A ENCRE DANS DES MACHINES D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 1235686 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00977479 A

Priority

  • DE 29921450 U
  • EP 0010859 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142015A1] The invention relates to an ink bar (1) comprising a control device for bringing back printing ink into the ink duct (20) of a printing machine when required. The aim of the invention is to arrange all the essential function pieces in a space-saving manner, whereby said pieces are used for adjusting the ink level. The ink bar (1) is made from a hollow rod profile having an undercut groove (4) on the lateral outer wall. Said groove serves for receiving cables (5). Discharge valves (8) and the supply device of an ink valve are arranged in the inner chamber of the rod profile. The ink valve is coupled to a sensor (9) and said valves are connected by means of the cable (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/08; B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29921450 U1 20001005; EP 1235686 A1 20020904; EP 1235686 B1 20030709; US 6640710 B1 20031104; WO 0142015 A1 20010614

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051104

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002872 P 20030814

2003-07-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI