Global Patent Index - EP 1235690 A2

EP 1235690 A2 2002-09-04 - BELT DRIVEN MEDIA TRANSPORT IN A PRINTER

Title (en)

BELT DRIVEN MEDIA TRANSPORT IN A PRINTER

Title (de)

BANDGETRIEBENER MEDIENTRANSPORT IN EINEM DRUCKER

Title (fr)

TRANSPORT DE SUPPORTS ENTRAINES PAR UNE COURROIE DANS UNE IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 1235690 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992670 A

Priority

  • US 0042650 W
  • US 45850999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142030A2] A moving belt accurately transports a wide variety of media through the print zone of an ink jet printer without distortion caused by tension in the media and without pinch rollers, star wheels, nip rollers, or other media transport assisting apparatus. The belt may be horizontally mounted and may comprise a coated paper material for ink absorption and high sliding friction characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/08; B41J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/02 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 3/4078 (2013.01); B41J 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142030A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142030 A2 20010614; WO 0142030 A3 20020131; AU 4520501 A 20010618; DE 60008787 D1 20040408; DE 60008787 T2 20050210; EP 1235690 A2 20020904; EP 1235690 B1 20040303; JP 2003516257 A 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121206

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60008787

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121206

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008787 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PITPIT, GERALD, T.

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIRTH, STEVEN, J.

2004-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHERBAN, RUDOLF

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI