Global Patent Index - EP 1235717 A2

EP 1235717 A2 2002-09-04 - A TRAY CONTAINER AND BLANK

Title (en)

A TRAY CONTAINER AND BLANK

Title (de)

SCHALE UND ZUSCHNITT

Title (fr)

CARTON ET EBAUCHE

Publication

EP 1235717 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00932271 A

Priority

  • GB 9910433 A
  • US 0012809 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068093A2] A tray and a blank (10) for forming the tray for holding foodstuff or the like which tray is formed from paperboard or like foldable sheet material and can be erected from a flat collapsed condition into a position of use, the tray comprising a plurality of tray walls including a base wall (18), opposed side and end walls (16, 20; 58, 70), wherein there further comprises a gusset panel structure (74, 78) spanning each side wall (16, 20) and either end wall (58, 70) to prevent egress of fluid from the base wall (18) at each corner of the tray, and wherein the gusset structure (74, 78) and the end walls (58, 70) are automatically erected in response to folding of the opposed side walls (16, 20) towards each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/24 (2006.01); B65D 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/241 (2013.01); B65D 5/2009 (2013.01); B65D 5/2047 (2013.01); B65D 5/445 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068093A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0068093 A2 20001116; WO 0068093 A3 20020711; AT 314263 T 20060115; AU 5001400 A 20001121; BR 0010339 A 20020521; DE 60025262 D1 20060202; DE 60025262 T2 20060831; EP 1235717 A2 20020904; EP 1235717 B1 20051228; ES 2256010 T3 20060716; GB 9910433 D0 19990707; JP 2004512232 A 20040422; MX PA01011255 A 20020621; ZA 200109312 B 20030212

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080508

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080509

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080508

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080509

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080508

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080508

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEBRAS PHILIPPE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-19 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256010 T3

2006-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-03-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025262 P 20060202

2006-01-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEBRAS, PHILIPPE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE