Global Patent Index - EP 1235751 A1

EP 1235751 A1 2002-09-04 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-CONCENTRATION ELECTROLYTIC WATER

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-CONCENTRATION ELECTROLYTIC WATER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HOCHKONZENTRIERTEM LEKTROLYTISCHEM WASSER

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'EAU ELECTROLYTIQUE A FORTE CONCENTRATION

Publication

EP 1235751 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00900934 A

Priority

  • KR 0000004 W
  • KR 19990044562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0127037A1] An apparatus for producing high-concentration electrolytic water is provided. Forming a pair of electrodes facing each other using a platinum (Pt) alloy containing palladium (Pd) prolongs the electrode life. Forming slits on the facing electrodes to make the apparatus highly efficient, thereby generating high-concentration electrolytic water, reduces a water flow rate and a space charge effect. Applying square-wave pulse power voltages can facilitate electrophysicochemical reaction and electrolysis. The polarities of applied pulse power voltages are alternated to suppress the electrodes from being scaled due to impurities. Strong alkaline water and strong acid water can be obtained by adding salt to service water. Further, neutral water can be obtained and hydrogen ion concentration (pH) can be controlled, by removing a separating membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 1/461

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/46 (2006.01); C02F 1/461 (2006.01); C25B 1/10 (2006.01); C25B 9/00 (2006.01); C25B 9/06 (2006.01); C25B 11/04 (2006.01); C25B 11/08 (2006.01); C25B 15/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/467 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/4618 (2013.01); C02F 1/4672 (2013.01); C02F 1/4674 (2013.01); C02F 2001/46133 (2013.01); C02F 2001/46157 (2013.01); C02F 2201/4611 (2013.01); C02F 2201/46115 (2013.01); C02F 2201/4613 (2013.01); C02F 2201/4617 (2013.01); C02F 2201/46175 (2013.01); C02F 2209/06 (2013.01); C02F 2303/04 (2013.01); Y02E 60/366 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0127037A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0127037 A1 20010419; AU 3078900 A 20010423; CN 1379737 A 20021113; EP 1235751 A1 20020904; JP 2003516216 A 20030513; KR 100346824 B1 20020803; KR 20010037187 A 20010507

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-24 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030801

2004-03-17 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030801

2004-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI