Global Patent Index - EP 1235789 A2

EP 1235789 A2 2002-09-04 - $g(b)-AMINOACID COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING $g(b)-AMYLOID PEPTIDE RELEASE AND/OR ITS SYNTHESIS

Title (en)

$g(b)-AMINOACID COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING $g(b)-AMYLOID PEPTIDE RELEASE AND/OR ITS SYNTHESIS

Title (de)

BETA-AMINOSÄURE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR INHIBIERUNG VON BETA-AMYLOIDPEPTID FREISETZUNG UND/ODER DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSES CONTENANT DES $g(b)-ACIDES AMINES UTILES POUR INHIBER LA LIBERATION ET/OU LA SYNTHESE DU PEPTIDE $g(b)-AMYLOIDE

Publication

EP 1235789 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00978212 A

Priority

  • US 0026277 W
  • US 16434999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134639A2] The present invention relates to beta -aminoacid containing compounds of formula (I) which inhibit beta -amyloid peptide release and/or its synthesis and are useful in treating Alzheimer's disease and cognition enhancement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 237/22; A61K 31/16; A61P 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07C 237/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 237/22 (2013.01); C07C 2601/14 (2017.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0134639A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134639 A2 20010517; WO 0134639 A3 20020711; AU 1569401 A 20010606; CA 2388750 A1 20010517; EP 1235789 A2 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2003-03-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BETA-AMINOACID COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING BETA-AMYLOID PEPTIDE RELEASE AND/OR ITS SYNTHESIS

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-09-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BETA-AMINOACID COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING $G(B)-AMYLOID PEPTIDE RELEASE AND/OR ITS SYNTHESIS

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI