Global Patent Index - EP 1235792 A4

EP 1235792 A4 2003-06-25 - PREPARATION OF [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES

Title (en)

PREPARATION OF [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON 4S-(4-g(a),7-g(a),10A-g(b))]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPIN-7-CARBONSÄURE METHYLESTER UND SEINER SALZE VIA NEUE DISULFIDE

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DE L'ESTER METHYLIQUE DE L'ACIDE [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIQUE, ET DE SES SELS VIA DE NOUVEAUX DISULFURES

Publication

EP 1235792 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99974268 A

Priority

US 9915380 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: HU0202462A2] Protected N,N'-L-homocystinediyl-bis(6,6-dimethoxy-L-norleucine methyl ester) derivatives (I) are new. The protected N,N'-L-homocystinediyl-bis(6,6-dimethoxy-L-norleucine methyl ester) derivatives are of formula (I). [Image] P1a protecting group. Independent claims are also included for: (1) protected L-homocystine bis(6,6-dimethoxy-L-norleucine methyl ester) disalts of formula (II). (2) a process for preparing (I); (3) a process for preparing protected methyl [4S-(4alpha ,7alpha ,10abeta )]-4-amino-octahydro-5-oxo- 7H-pyrido[2,1-b][1,3]thiazepine-7-carboxylate derivatives of formula (III), comprising reacting (I) with a reagent that cleaves the disulfide bond and subjecting the product to acid-catalyzed cyclization: (4) a process for preparing methyl [4S-(4alpha ,7alpha ,10abeta )]-4-amino-octahydro-5-oxo- 7H-pyrido[2,1-b][1,3]thiazepine-7-carboxylate (IV) comprising preparing (III) by process (3) and removing the protecting group; (5) a process for preparing [4S-(4alpha (R*),7alpha ,10abeta )]-octahydro-4-(2-mercapto-1-oxo -3-phenylpropylamino)-5- oxo-7H-pyrido[2,1-b][1,3]thiazepine-7-carboxylic acid (V), comprising: (a) preparing (IV) by process (4); (b) coupling (IV) with a 2-acylthio-3-phenylpropionic acid of formula (VI); and (c) treating the product of formula (VII) to remove the acyl group and convert the methyl ester group to a carboxylic acid group. [Image] [Image] [Image] [Image].

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 261/00; C07C 229/04; C07C 229/22; C07D 281/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07B 53/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 229/04 (2006.01); C07C 229/22 (2006.01); C07C 261/00 (2006.01); C07C 319/22 (2006.01); C07C 323/59 (2006.01); C07D 281/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1235792 A1 20020904; EP 1235792 A4 20030625; HU 0202462 A2 20021128; HU 0202462 A3 20050128; JP 2004514665 A 20040520; KR 20020067490 A 20020822

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PREPARATION OF ??4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA) -4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B 1,3 THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES

2005-09-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050303

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MONIOT, JEROME, L.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMIG, KEITH

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JASS, PAUL, A.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DILLON, JOHN, L., JR.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RACHA, SAIBABA

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHRIVASTAVA, SUSHIL, K.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINTER, WILLIAM, J.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VENIT, JOHN, J.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SWAMINATHAN, SHANKAR

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIMPSON, JAMES

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHEN, CHIEN-KUANG

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PACK, SHAWN, K.

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHWINDEN, MARK, D.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MONIOT, JEROME, L.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMIG, KEITH

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JASS, PAUL, A.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DILLON, JOHN, L., JR.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RACHA, SAIBABA

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHRIVASTAVA, SUSHIL, K.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINTER, WILLIAM, J.

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VENIT, JOHN, J.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI