Global Patent Index - EP 1235806 A1

EP 1235806 A1 2002-09-04 - NOVEL 5-PYRIMIDINECARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

NOVEL 5-PYRIMIDINECARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAID DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

NEUE 5-PYRIMIDINCARBOXAMID-DERIVATE UND DIESE DERIVATE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE GEMISCHE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE 5-PYRIMIDINECARBOXAMIDE ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES RENFERMANT CES DERIVES

Publication

EP 1235806 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00981886 A

Priority

  • KR 0001364 W
  • KR 19990053294 A
  • KR 19990064403 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138308A1] The present invention relates to novel 5-pyrimidinecarboxamide derivatives and the pharmaceutical compositions containing said derivatives, and more specifically, to 5-pyrimidinecarboxamide derivatives and their pharmaceutically acceptable salts, the process for preparing them, and the pharmaceutical compositions containing said compounds as active ingredients. In particular, said 5-pyrimidinecarboxamide derivatives of the present invention, due to their inhibitory activity against the proliferation of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) as well as hepatitis B virus (HBV), can be used as a therapeutic agent as well as a preventive agent for hepatitis B and acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 403/12; A61K 31/505; A61P 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 403/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 403/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138308 A1 20010531; AU 1899401 A 20010604; EP 1235806 A1 20020904; EP 1235806 A4 20040204

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041106

2004-08-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2004-02-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 403/12 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/00 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/505 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 403/12 J

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 239:00 J

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 231:00 J

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOON, SUNG JUNE

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, SANG WOOK

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, NAM DOO

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, YONG KYUN YONG KYUN PARK C/O WON INT.

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, GEUN, HYUNG

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, JONG, WOO

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, SANG, JIN

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, HEE, JEOUNG

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI