Global Patent Index - EP 1235807 A1

EP 1235807 A1 2002-09-04 - B-AMINO ACID-, ASPARTIC ACID- AND DIAMINOPROPIONIC-BASED INHIBITORS OF FACTOR XA

Title (en)

B-AMINO ACID-, ASPARTIC ACID- AND DIAMINOPROPIONIC-BASED INHIBITORS OF FACTOR XA

Title (de)

AUF B-AMINOSÄURE, ASPARAGINSÄURE UND DIAMINOPROPIONSÄURE BASIERENDE INHIBITOREN VON FAKTOR XA

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR Xa A BASE D'ACIDES $g(b)-AMINES, ASPARTIQUES ET DIAMINOPROPIONIQUES

Publication

EP 1235807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00980439 A

Priority

  • US 0031520 W
  • US 16724099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138309A1] Novel beta -amino acid-, aspartic acid- and diaminopropionic-based compounds of the general formula A-Q-D-E-G-J-X wherein A, Q, D, E, G, J and X have the meanings given in the description, their salts and compositions related thereto having activity against mammalian factor Xa are disclosed. The compounds are useful <i>in vitro</i> or <i>in vivo</i> for preventing or treating coagulation disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 213/75; A61K 31/18; A61K 31/44; A61P 7/02; C07C 311/16; C07C 311/18; C07D 295/18; C07D 409/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/75 (2006.01); A61K 31/18 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/223 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); C07C 311/16 (2006.01); C07C 311/18 (2006.01); C07C 311/19 (2006.01); C07C 311/46 (2006.01); C07D 207/04 (2006.01); C07D 213/81 (2006.01); C07D 295/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/81 (2013.01); C07C 311/16 (2013.01); C07C 311/19 (2013.01); C07C 311/46 (2013.01); C07D 295/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0138309A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138309 A1 20010531; AU 1770001 A 20010604; CA 2392576 A1 20010531; EP 1235807 A1 20020904; JP 2003514897 A 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHU, BING-YAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, LINGYAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUANG, WENRONG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, YANHONG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUCKETT, JINGMEI, FAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SU, TING

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT

2004-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHU, BING-YAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, LINGYAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUANG, WENRONG

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, YANHONG

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUCKETT, JINGMEI, FAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SU, TING

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHU, BING-YAN

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, LINGYAN

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUANG, WENRONG

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, YANHONG

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUCKETT, JINGMEI, FAN

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SU, TING

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCARBOROUGH, ROBERT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI