Global Patent Index - EP 1235823 A1

EP 1235823 A1 2002-09-04 - H-ANNELLATED BENZO F]CHROMENES

Title (en)

H-ANNELLATED BENZO F]CHROMENES

Title (de)

H-ANNELLIERTE BENZO F]CHROMENE

Title (fr)

BENZO F]CHROMENES H ANNELES

Publication

EP 1235823 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01956558 A

Priority

  • DE 10045848 A
  • EP 0108557 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222594A1] The invention relates to specific photochromic h-annellated benzo[f]chrome derivatives and the use thereof in all types of plastic material, especially for ophthalmic purposes. The invention relates specifically to photochromic compounds derived from benzo[f]chromenes, said compounds comprising in their open form particular long wave length absorption maxima, whereby a multitude of colours from violet to blue can be produced in applications in phototropic glass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 311/78; C07D 311/94; C07D 493/06; C07D 498/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 311/92 (2006.01); C07D 311/78 (2006.01); C07D 311/94 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01); C07D 493/06 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 498/06 (2006.01); F16C 19/26 (2006.01); F16C 33/34 (2006.01); F16C 33/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 493/04 (2013.01); C07D 311/78 (2013.01); C07D 311/94 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222594A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222594 A1 20020321; AU 778377 B2 20041202; AU 7850501 A 20020326; CA 2390770 A1 20020321; CA 2390770 C 20090901; DE 50100383 D1 20030821; EP 1235823 A1 20020904; EP 1235823 B1 20030716; ES 2201041 T3 20040316; JP 2004509109 A 20040325; US 2003040623 A1 20030227; US 6686468 B2 20040203; ZA 200203275 B 20030724

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120725

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120724

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100383

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120724

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111013 AND 20111019

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-28 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20110929

2006-05-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-05-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-02-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-01-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201041 T3

2004-03-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-08-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RODENSTOCK GMBH

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100383 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: H-ANNELLATED BENZO (F)CHROMENES

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR