Global Patent Index - EP 1235838 A1

EP 1235838 A1 2002-09-04 - 23 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

23 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

23 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

23 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1235838 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00982116 A

Priority

  • US 0031282 W
  • US 16641499 P
  • US 21966500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136440A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/00; C07K 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136440 A1 20010525; AU 1918601 A 20010530; CA 2388922 A1 20010525; EP 1235838 A1 20020904; EP 1235838 A4 20030910; JP 2003514543 A 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-09-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/00 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/00 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI