Global Patent Index - EP 1235844 A1

EP 1235844 A1 2002-09-04 - 28 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

28 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

28 HUMAN-SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

28 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1235844 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00977035 A

Priority

  • US 0030628 W
  • US 16474499 P
  • US 21514000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134627A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 31/7088; A61K 31/713; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/12; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/16 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/04 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/20 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C12N 2799/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134627 A1 20010517; AU 1472701 A 20010606; CA 2389724 A1 20010517; EP 1235844 A1 20020904; EP 1235844 A4 20050119; JP 2003520031 A 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051213

2005-01-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/18 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/7088 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/713 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 B

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI