Global Patent Index - EP 1235845 A4

EP 1235845 A4 2003-06-25 - 24 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

24 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

24 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

24 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1235845 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00978315 A

Priority

  • US 0030040 W
  • US 16358099 P
  • US 21513000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134769A2] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07H 21/02; C07K 5/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 0166690 A2 20010913 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0188084 A2 20011122 - SHANGHAI BIOWINDOW GENE DEV [CN], et al
  • [E] WO 0220569 A2 20020314 - SCHERING CORP [US]
  • [X] ITOH A ET AL: "Cloning and expressions of three mammalian homologues of Drosophila slit suggest possible roles for Slit in the formation and maintenance of the nervous system.", BRAIN RESEARCH. MOLECULAR BRAIN RESEARCH. NETHERLANDS 20 NOV 1998, vol. 62, no. 2, 20 November 1998 (1998-11-20), pages 175 - 186, XP000937694, ISSN: 0169-328X
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 31 July 1999 (1999-07-31), "Human DNA sequence from clone GS1-115M3 on chromosome Xq27.1-28 Contains a gene for a novel protein, CXorf1 (chromosome X open reading frame 1), ESTs, STSs, GSSs and a CpG Island.", XP002226986, Database accession no. AL109653
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 10 June 1997 (1997-06-10), HILLIER L. ET AL.: "zx03h10.s1 Soares_total_fetus_Nb2HF8_9w Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:785443 3', mRNA sequence.", XP002226987, Database accession no. AA449213
  • [A] JACOBS K A ET AL: "A GENETIC SELECTION FOR ISOLATING CDNAS ENCODING SECRETED PROTEINS", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 198, 1 October 1997 (1997-10-01), pages 289 - 296, XP002045919, ISSN: 0378-1119
  • [T] DATABASE GENESEQ [online] 27 August 2002 (2002-08-27), ROSEN CA, ET AL.,: "Human albumin fusion protein #411", XP002226478, Database accession no. ABG63736 & WO 0177137 A1 20011018 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • See also references of WO 0134769A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134769 A2 20010517; WO 0134769 A3 20020117; AU 1578901 A 20010606; CA 2388019 A1 20010517; EP 1235845 A2 20020904; EP 1235845 A4 20030625; JP 2003513663 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040810

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI