Global Patent Index - EP 1235889 A1

EP 1235889 A1 2002-09-04 - METHOD FOR GASIFYING CARBONACEOUS COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GASIFYING CARBONACEOUS COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERGASUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GAZEIFICATION DE COMPOSES CARBONES

Publication

EP 1235889 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985382 A

Priority

  • FR 0003360 W
  • FR 9915246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140411A1] The invention concerns a method for gasifying carbonaceous compounds, comprising mineral loads and/or potential contaminants, and a gasifying installation comprising means for containing a molten slag bath, means for loading said compounds into said bath, means for injecting at least the oxidant into the bath so that the carbonaceous compounds/ oxidant mixture is above stoichiometric level, whereby a first part of the compounds is pyrolysed, a second part is subjected to a combustion reaction capable of yielding heat energy to the slag bath, and a third part is diffused in the bath, means for recovering the gases derived from pyrolysis and combustion of the first and second parts, and means for lowering the temperature of part of the molten slag so as to solidify it, whereby at least a portion of the third part of the compounds containing loads and/or potential contaminants is immobilised.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/57

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/57 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/57 (2013.01); C10K 1/04 (2013.01); C10K 1/10 (2013.01); C10J 2200/158 (2013.01); C10J 2300/165 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140411A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140411 A1 20010607; AT 499430 T 20110315; AU 2181801 A 20010612; CA 2393088 A1 20010607; CA 2393088 C 20100330; DE 60045662 D1 20110407; DK 1235889 T3 20110614; EP 1235889 A1 20020904; EP 1235889 B1 20110223; ES 2364123 T3 20110825; FR 2801895 A1 20010608; FR 2801895 B1 20020301; PT 1235889 E 20110601; US 2003056438 A1 20030327; US 7087098 B2 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 499430 T

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-07-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130603

2013-06-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130603

2012-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20120109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-03-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60045662

- Effective date: 20111124

2012-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111124

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-09-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-08-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2364123 T3

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-07-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110524

2011-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG

2011-06-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-06-08 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-06-01 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20110523

2011-04-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60045662

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60045662 P 20110407

2011-03-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2011-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-12-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR GASIFYING CARBONACEOUS COMPOUNDS

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050905

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI