Global Patent Index - EP 1235903 A2

EP 1235903 A2 2002-09-04 - METABOLLICALLY ENGINEERED CELLS OVEREXPRESSING PYRUVATE CARBOXYLASE OR PYRUVATE PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE CARBOKYLASE, AND METHODS TO PRODUCE AND USE SUCH CELLS

Title (en)

METABOLLICALLY ENGINEERED CELLS OVEREXPRESSING PYRUVATE CARBOXYLASE OR PYRUVATE PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE CARBOKYLASE, AND METHODS TO PRODUCE AND USE SUCH CELLS

Title (de)

IM STOFFWECHSEL VERÄNDERTE ZELLEN DIE PYRUVAT-CARBOXYLASE ODER PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE-CARBOXYLASEÜBEREXPRIMIEREN, UND METHODEN SOLCHE ZELLEN HERZUSTELLEN UND ZU NUTZEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDES D'EXPRESSION DE PROTEINES A HAUT RENDEMENT

Publication

EP 1235903 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00973568 A

Priority

  • US 0028578 W
  • US 15946799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0127258A2] Increasing pyruvate carboxylase activity in various protein expression systems results in enhanced protein yields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12P 13/08 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/93 (2013.01); C12P 13/08 (2013.01); C12P 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0127258A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0127258 A2 20010419; WO 0127258 A3 20011227; AR 026892 A1 20030305; AU 1206801 A 20010423; BR 0014758 A 20020702; CA 2387605 A1 20010419; EP 1235903 A2 20020904; JP 2003511067 A 20030325; MX PA02003634 A 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1052198

2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EITEMAN, MARK A.

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTMAN, ELLIOT

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOKARN, RAVI R.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI