Global Patent Index - EP 1235907 A1

EP 1235907 A1 2002-09-04 - 6 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

6 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

6 MENSCHLICHE, AUSGESCHIEDENE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

6 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1235907 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00977046 A

Priority

  • US 0030657 W
  • US 16473199 P
  • US 21513200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0134799A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0134799 A1 20010517; AU 1473801 A 20010606; CA 2388912 A1 20010517; EP 1235907 A1 20020904; EP 1235907 A4 20030730; JP 2003513668 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-07-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/00 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/11 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/16 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/02 B

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI