Global Patent Index - EP 1235942 A1

EP 1235942 A1 2002-09-04 - NICKEL POWDER DESULFURISATION

Title (en)

NICKEL POWDER DESULFURISATION

Title (de)

ENTSCHWEFELUNG VON NICKELPULVER

Title (fr)

DESULFURATION DE POUDRE DE NICKEL

Publication

EP 1235942 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00972449 A

Priority

  • AU 0001318 W
  • AU PQ375499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0132945A1] A process and apparatus for desulfurisation of nickel powder is disclosed in which the nickel powder is heated in a hydrogen-containing atmosphere to promote the formation of hydrogen sulfide gas. The hydrogen sulfide gas is then removed using a desulfurisation agent. Hydrogen gas is used as a transfer agent to transport the sulfur from the nickel powder to a suitable desulfurisation agent. In this way the sulfur content of the nickel powder can be substantially reduced. The apparatus (30) includes a rotary kiln (32) in which the off-gases are recycled back into the kiln via an adsorbent H>2<S filter (34). The nickel powder is fed to the rotary kiln (32) via a nickel powder feed hopper (35) which pre-heats the powder prior to entry into the kiln. The kiln is indirectly heated using natural gas. A gas blower (36) maintains a flow of hydrogen containing gas through the rotary kiln in a counter-current direction relative to the direction of transport of the nickel powder through the kiln. Filter (34) incorporates a filter membrane made from a suitable non-volatile desulfurising agent such as calcium, magnesium metal or calcium hydroxide which can be periodically replaced as required. The desulfurised nickel powder exits from the rotary kiln (32) via a discharge hopper (42) where some cooling of the nickel powder occurs. From there the desulfurised nickel powder is fed to a hot briquetting machine (44) which presses the powder into small briquettes. A significant improvement in the production of on specification nickel briquettes can be achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 23/06; C22B 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/14 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22B 1/24 (2006.01); C22B 5/12 (2006.01); C22B 9/16 (2006.01); C22B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/16 (2013.01); C22B 5/12 (2013.01); C22B 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0132945 A1 20010510; AU 1117201 A 20010514; AU PQ375499 A0 19991125; CA 2389342 A1 20010510; EP 1235942 A1 20020904; EP 1235942 A4 20030502; JP 2003514111 A 20030415; NO 20021776 A 20020612; NO 20021776 D0 20020416; ZA 200202801 B 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR LI

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22B 23/06 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22B 9/05 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22B 1/11 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 1/00 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22F 9/16 B

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI