Global Patent Index - EP 1235944 A1

EP 1235944 A1 2002-09-04 - HIGH STRENGTH ALUMINIUM ALLOY SHEET AND PROCESS

Title (en)

HIGH STRENGTH ALUMINIUM ALLOY SHEET AND PROCESS

Title (de)

HOCHFESTES BLECH AUS ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

TOLE D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM DE HAUTE RESISTANCE ET PROCESSUS

Publication

EP 1235944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00942782 A

Priority

  • IB 9902116 W
  • US 0016204 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140531A1] Aluminum sheets and methods for manufacturing aluminum sheets are provided. The present invention involves control of processing conditions in order to achieve a fine grain size (i.e. ASTM rating of 8.5 or greater) in the material prior to a final cold working operation. Also included within the scope of the present invention are products having a fine grain size which have strength levels above what can be obtained in 5xxx alloys.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140531A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140531 A1 20010607; AU 5735400 A 20010612; DE 1235944 T1 20030918; EP 1235944 A1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060530

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-09-18 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2003-06-13 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI