Global Patent Index - EP 1235950 A2

EP 1235950 A2 2002-09-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROWINNING POWDER METAL FROM SOLUTION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROWINNING POWDER METAL FROM SOLUTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROGEWINNUNG VON METALLPUDER AUS EINER LÖSUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA RECUPERATION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE METAL PULVERULENT DANS UNE SOLUTION

Publication

EP 1235950 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00945447 A

Priority

  • AU 0000877 W
  • AU PQ176299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0107684A2] A cell (1) for electrowinning a metal in powder form from solution is disclosed. The cell (1) includes a housing (2) having an inlet (3) towards one end thereof and an outlet (4) towards an opposed end. The cell has a cylindrical anode (6) extending substantially axially through the housing (2) and a cathode (7) surrounding the anode (6) spaced outwardly away therefrom. The anode (6) and cathode (7) define a flow passage (8) therebetween having a gap of 5 to 25 millimetres. In use the cell has a substantially vertical orientation with the inlet (3) at the bottom and the outlet (4) at the top. During the flow of process solution through the cell (1) metal powder is deposited on the cathode (7). Periodically the flow process solution is interrupted and flush solution is passed in a reverse direction through the cell to remove powder metal from the cathode (7). A bank of cells in which the individual cells are connected in parallel to respectively an inlet main and an outlet main is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 5/02; C25C 1/00; C25C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 5/02 (2006.01); C25C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 7/00 (2013.01); C25C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0107684 A2 20010201; WO 0107684 A3 20020711; AP 1419 A 20050526; AP 200202411 D0 20020331; AU PQ176299 A0 19990812; CA 2416619 A1 20010201; CA 2416619 C 20091006; EP 1235950 A2 20020904; EP 1235950 A4 20060329; JP 2003505598 A 20030212; JP 4594573 B2 20101208; OA 12043 A 20060502; ZA 200201356 B 20031029

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150207

2014-10-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140926

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061221

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061221

2006-03-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060209

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI