Global Patent Index - EP 1235972 A1

EP 1235972 A1 2002-09-04 - PIPE EXPANSION DEVICE

Title (en)

PIPE EXPANSION DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERWEITERUNG EINES ROHRES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EXPANSION DE TUYAU

Publication

EP 1235972 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00990625 A

Priority

  • EP 0012024 W
  • EP 99309532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0138693A1] A device (1) for expanding a pipe comprising a bi-conical sleeve (3) having a first section (5) and a second section (11), which sections (5, 11) are provided with at least two longitudinal guide channels (20), first wedges (25), wherein each first wedge (25) tapers into the direction in which the first section (5) widens and is provided with a support element (26) that co-operates with the corresponding longitudinal guide channel of the first section (5), second wedges (30), wherein each second wedge (30) tapers into the direction in which the second section (11) widens and is provided with a support element (31) that co-operates with the corresponding longitudinal guide channel (20) of the second section (11), and means for moving the wedges (25, 30) into each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 29/10; E21B 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 7/12 (2006.01); E21B 29/10 (2006.01); E21B 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 7/12 (2013.01); E21B 43/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0138693A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0138693 A1 20010531; EP 1235972 A1 20020904; EP 1235972 B1 20030528; GC 0000153 A 20050629; NO 20022511 A 20020725; NO 20022511 D0 20020528; NO 327160 B1 20090504; OA 12112 A 20060504; US 6460615 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): GB NL

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR