Global Patent Index - EP 1236106 A1

EP 1236106 A1 2002-09-04 - RAID CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH ATA EMULATION HOST INTERFACE

Title (en)

RAID CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH ATA EMULATION HOST INTERFACE

Title (de)

RAID-CONTROLLER-SYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN MIT ATA-EMULIERENDER HOSTSCHNITTSTELLE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE RAID AVEC INTERFACE HOTE A EMULATION ATA

Publication

EP 1236106 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00966864 A

Priority

  • US 0026343 W
  • US 15600199 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0122221A1] A RAID storage device controller (70) provides a host interface (56) for interfacing the controller to a host system bus. The host interface is isolated from the attached storage devices, for example IDE disk drives, so that the actual attached drives are not limited in number or interface protocol. Various device ports can be implemented, and various RAID strategies, e.g. level 3 and level 5, can be used. In all the cases, the host interface provides a standard, uniform interface to the host, namely an ATA interface (82, 84 and 86), and preferably a dual channel ATA interface. The host interface emulates the ATA single or dual channel interface and emulates one or two attached IDE devices per channel, regardless of the actual number of devices physically connected to the controller. Thus, for example, five or seven IDE drives can be deployed in RAID level 5 protocol without changing the standard BIOS in a PCI host machine. Thus the RAID controller is transparent relative to a standard dual channel ATA controller board.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/455; G06F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/10 (2006.01); G06F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0613 (2013.01); G06F 3/0614 (2013.01); G06F 3/0664 (2013.01); G06F 3/0689 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0122221 A1 20010329; AU 7714700 A 20010424; CA 2385492 A1 20010329; CA 2385492 C 20050816; CN 1222876 C 20051012; CN 1391672 A 20030115; EP 1236106 A1 20020904; EP 1236106 A4 20021030; JP 2003510683 A 20030318; KR 100441189 B1 20040721; TW 476030 B 20020211

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1050935

2008-10-29 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20041115

2005-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050118

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2002-12-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 9/455 A, 7G 06F 13/00 B, 7G 06F 3/06 B

2002-10-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI