Global Patent Index - EP 1236146 A1

EP 1236146 A1 2002-09-04 - A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR HANDLING OF INFORMATION REGARDING ECONOMIC EVENTS

Title (en)

A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR HANDLING OF INFORMATION REGARDING ECONOMIC EVENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON AUF WIRTSCHAFTLICHE EREIGNISSE BEZOGENE INFORMATIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT SERVANT A GERER DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A DES EVENEMENTS ECONOMIQUES

Publication

EP 1236146 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00973318 A

Priority

  • SE 0002027 W
  • SE 9903768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0129724A1] A method and an arrangement are suggested for handling of information regarding economic events with a paying party and a payment-receiving party. The arrangement includes at least a first computerised user interface (1, 2) for a first of said parties, a computer device (10) including a computer application with a data base (11) and at least a second computerised user interface (3, 4) for the second of said parties. The first user interface, the second user interface and the computer device are connected to a computer communication device (9). The computer device permits recording of information regarding such an event in said computer application and includes means for processing the information and transferring the processed information to a computerised bookkeeping system, which is associated with said first party.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0129724A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0129724 A1 20010426; WO 0129724 A8 20020510; AU 1184101 A 20010430; AU 764397 B2 20030814; CA 2386451 A1 20010426; CN 1382282 A 20021127; EP 1236146 A1 20020904; JP 2003512678 A 20030402; NZ 518495 A 20040130; SE 515037 C2 20010605; SE 9903768 D0 19991019; SE 9903768 L 20010420

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-02-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBI, EZ BIZ IT AB

2012-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUNDIN, ADIM

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUNDIN, ADIM

2010-05-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUNDIN, ADIM

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061013

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI