Global Patent Index - EP 1236148 A1

EP 1236148 A1 2002-09-04 - COMPUTER-AIDED AUCTIONING METHOD AND AUCTIONING SYSTEM

Title (en)

COMPUTER-AIDED AUCTIONING METHOD AND AUCTIONING SYSTEM

Title (de)

COMPUTER-GESTÜTZTES AUKTIONSVERFAHREN UND AUKTIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE VENTE AUX ENCHERES ASSISTE PAR ORDINATEUR ET SYSTEME DE VENTE AUX ENCHERES

Publication

EP 1236148 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00975734 A

Priority

  • CH 0000632 W
  • CH 223599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142999A1] The invention relates to a computer-aided auctioning method and auctioning system according to which suppliers offer products, services and/or information as auction objects. Information on auction objects is collected in an input module and is distributed by means of telecommunications channels. Interested customers make auction bids for offered auction objects. Information on bids is provided, supplied to an evaluation unit by means of a telecommunications network and is evaluated in said unit. The best bid for an auction object is determined. Class indicators are added to the information on auction objects according to a predefined object classification. The information on auction objects is filtered according to customer-specific object profiles. A bid amount that has been input by the interested customer is linked to at least certain data when the information on bids is provided in the communications terminal of the customer, whereby said data is contained in the information on auction objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G06F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142999A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142999 A1 20010614; AT 259976 T 20040315; AU 1377401 A 20010618; AU 764244 B2 20030814; DE 50005356 D1 20040325; EP 1236148 A1 20020904; EP 1236148 B1 20040218; ES 2216984 T3 20041101; JP 2003516590 A 20030513; NZ 519323 A 20041126; PT 1236148 E 20040730; US 2014297451 A1 20141002; US 8756143 B1 20140617; ZA 200204341 B 20030818

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151128

2016-12-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161228

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151128

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005356

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141127

2015-08-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-06-04 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-04-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Effective date: 20091020

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SWISSCOM FIXNET AG

- Effective date: 20091020

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2009-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: SWISSCOM A.G.ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6, WORBLAUFEN /

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: SWISSCOM A.G.ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6, WORBLAUFEN /

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: SWISSCOM A.G.

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-12-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091119 AND 20091125

2009-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM FIXNET AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)

2009-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)

2009-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SWISSCOM FIXNET AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM MOBILE AG#SCHWARZTORSTRASSE 61#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM FIXNET AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6 WORBLAUFEN / ITTIGEN#3050 BERN (CH)

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2004-11-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216984 T3

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-07-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401335

2004-05-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005356 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI