Global Patent Index - EP 1236177 A1

EP 1236177 A1 2002-09-04 - AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS OF ANATOMICAL IMAGES TIME SEQUENCE

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS OF ANATOMICAL IMAGES TIME SEQUENCE

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHE ANALYSE EINER ZEITREIHE VON ANATOMISCHEN BILDERN

Title (fr)

ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE DE SEQUENCE TEMPORELLE D'IMAGES ANATOMIQUES

Publication

EP 1236177 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988697 A

Priority

  • EP 0010658 W
  • IT PI990069 A
  • IT PI20000041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0135339A2] The method allows prefiltering, segmentation and analysing time sequence of volumetric images in the field of medical diagnosis. In particular the system allows detecting and selecting, from anatomical images, for example cardiac images, an organ or part of it by means instruments of segmentation and carrying out quantitative analysis for anatomical studies, function and perfusion. From the images cardiache is calcola the volume of the cavity and the thickness of the miocardium and as these variano in the tempo; in the images cardiache of perfusion, is calculated automatically the ventricular wall by means of suitable operations of segmentation and, then, is subdivide this wall in a plurality of selected regions obtaining, by means of a graphic window, time/intensity curves relative to each zone, comprised the reference curve corresponding to the ventricular cavity. The method allows di: 1) to filter the curve tempo/intensita' from heat noise and due to the hardware of the machine and by artefacts due to meccanismi fisiologici, such as the heart beat and attivita' vaso-motoria spontanea; 2) estract data relative to the flow in the regions of the myocardium wall selected automatically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 7/00 (2006.01); G06T 5/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 7/0012 (2013.01); G06T 7/12 (2017.01); G06T 7/149 (2017.01); G06T 7/62 (2017.01); G06T 2207/20116 (2013.01); G06T 2207/30048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0135339A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0135339 A2 20010517; WO 0135339 A3 20020725; AU 2505201 A 20010606; EP 1236177 A1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2007-10-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06T 7/00 20060101AFI20070830BHEP

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060807

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060807

2002-10-23 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI