Global Patent Index - EP 1236267 A2

EP 1236267 A2 2002-09-04 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A SET OF MACHINES

Title (en)

DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A SET OF MACHINES

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINE GRUPPE VON MASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UN GROUPE DE MACHINES

Publication

EP 1236267 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00993358 A

Priority

  • BE 9900807 A
  • EP 0012456 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143270A2] The invention relates to a drive system for driving a set of machines (2, 3, 4) that are each provided with a rectifier (6). According to the inventive drive system, the inputs (7) to the control devices (8) of the drive motors of the machines are interlinked via an electric line (14) that permits the circulation of current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02P 7/05; H02P 7/67

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 3/06 (2006.01); H02P 5/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02P 5/00 (2013.01); H02P 3/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143270 A2 20010614; WO 0143270 A3 20011227; BE 1013175 A3 20011002; CN 100499353 C 20090610; CN 1409890 A 20030409; EP 1236267 A2 20020904; US 2002190671 A1 20021219; US 7088061 B2 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 25/08 20060101AFI20091207BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 5/00 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020511

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR