Global Patent Index - EP 1236311 A2

EP 1236311 A2 2002-09-04 - CONTROL METHOD

Title (en)

CONTROL METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON FUNKSTATIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1236311 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00993209 A

Priority

  • DE 0004109 W
  • DE 19956318 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139432A2] The invention relates to a method for controlling a first radio station (10) and a second radio station (11), said radio stations being both connected to one another via at least one communication link (20) and being controlled in accordance with a communication protocol (250, 260). The first radio station (10) communicates with at least one terminal (5, 6, 7) in accordance with a frame-structured radio transmission protocol (211, 212) with packet switching, whereby control messages (101, 103) for controlling the communication link(s) and/or for managing the radio stations (10, 11) are defined using an additional protocol layer (280), which uses the communication protocol (250, 260).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/28; H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 69/32 (2013.01); H04W 76/20 (2018.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139432A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139432 A2 20010531; WO 0139432 A3 20011129; DE 19956318 A1 20010531; EP 1236311 A2 20020904; EP 1236311 B1 20040218; JP 2003516028 A 20030507; JP 4723148 B2 20110713; US 7263093 B1 20070828

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171121

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-29 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50005359

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005359 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RADIO STATIONS

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VOLLMER, VASCO

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR