Global Patent Index - EP 1236340 A1

EP 1236340 A1 2002-09-04 - ECHO CANCELLER IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AT A TERMINAL

Title (en)

ECHO CANCELLER IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AT A TERMINAL

Title (de)

ENDGERÄTBASIERTER ECHOKOMPENSATOR IN EINEM NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ANNULEUR D'ECHO DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AU NIVEAU D'UN TERMINAL

Publication

EP 1236340 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00990039 A

Priority

  • FR 0003450 W
  • FR 9915643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143413A1] The invention concerns a device for processing echo in a communication system at a terminal comprising a first transducer (4) and a second transducer (5), said echo processing device (1, 101, 201) itself including an adaptive echo cancelling device (3, 103, 203). The invention is characterised in that said echo processing device comprises a device (2. 102, 202) processing residual echo at the output of said adaptive echo cancelling device (3, 103, 203).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/02 (2006.01); H04B 3/23 (2006.01); H04M 1/60 (2006.01); H04M 9/00 (2006.01); H04M 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 9/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143413A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143413 A1 20010614; CA 2394370 A1 20010614; EP 1236340 A1 20020904; FR 2802375 A1 20010615; FR 2802375 B1 20020920; IL 149187 D0 20021110; JP 2003516673 A 20030513; US 2003099349 A1 20030529; US 7023986 B2 20060404

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070426

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050425

2004-07-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE GB IT LI

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCALART, PASCAL

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LE TOURNEUR, GREGOIRE

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOUTEILLE FRANCK

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEAUGEANT, CHRISTOPHE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR