Global Patent Index - EP 1236375 A2

EP 1236375 A2 2002-09-04 - FLAT LOUDSPEAKER SYSTEM FOR BASS REPRODUCTION

Title (en)

FLAT LOUDSPEAKER SYSTEM FOR BASS REPRODUCTION

Title (de)

FLACHLAUTSPRECHERANORDNUNG FÜR TIEFTONWIEDERGABE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE HAUT-PARLEURS PLATS POUR REPRODUCTION DES GRAVES

Publication

EP 1236375 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00979559 A

Priority

  • DE 19955867 A
  • EP 0011259 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139541A2] The invention relates to a flat loudspeaker system comprising a flat, non-radiative housing (2, 4), which encloses a housing volume, and comprising a plate membrane (1), which is arranged inside a front opening of the housing (2, 4), as well as a support (3), which is arranged between the housing (2, 4) and plate membrane (1) and which is provided for holding and insulating the plate membrane (1) from the housing (2, 4). According to the invention, at least one acoustic transducer (8, 26, 11, 39, 40) for bass tones is mounted on the housing (2, 4) and/or on the plate membrane (1) in such a manner that the acoustic transducer membrane forms a portion of the outer wall of the housing (2, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/26 (2006.01); H04R 1/28 (2006.01); H04R 5/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/2819 (2013.01); H04R 1/26 (2013.01); H04R 1/2842 (2013.01); H04R 5/02 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 1/2834 (2013.01); H04R 1/2865 (2013.01); H04R 2440/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139541A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139541 A2 20010531; WO 0139541 A3 20020214; DE 19955867 A1 20010621; EP 1236375 A2 20020904; EP 1236375 B1 20050119

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009306 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BACHMANN, WOLFGANG

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRUMP, GERHARD

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REGL, HANS-JUERGEN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIGANKI, ANDREAS

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR