Global Patent Index - EP 1236412 A1

EP 1236412 A1 2002-09-04 - Band fastener with continuous adjustment

Title (en)

Band fastener with continuous adjustment

Title (de)

Verschluss für Band mit beständiger Verstellung

Title (fr)

Fermeture de bande avec réglage continu

Publication

EP 1236412 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02004010 A

Priority

IT VI20010048 A

Abstract (en)

A band fastener with continuous regulation, to be applied, in particular, to accessories, items of clothing and sports footwear as well as to body-protection clothing and footwear, in which prevention against a possible loosening, a continuous and micrometric regulation and a rapid unfastening must be guaranteed. Said fastener being characterised in that it comprises a toothed band (2) which interacts with a disk (3) equipped with a protruding profile (6); such a band and such a disk are contained inside a box-shaped body (4), thus constituting a fastening mechanism between two flaps to be drawn together, where a first flap is attached to the base of the box-shaped body (4) and the other flap is attached to the non-engaged end of the band itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/08 (2006.01); A43C 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/1413 (2013.01); A43C 11/08 (2013.01); A43C 11/1473 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236412 A1 20020904; IT VI20010048 A1 20020902

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI