Global Patent Index - EP 1236414 A2

EP 1236414 A2 2002-09-04 - Latch piece

Title (en)

Latch piece

Title (de)

Riegelelement

Title (fr)

Elément de verrou

Publication

EP 1236414 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251236 A

Priority

GB 0104545 A

Abstract (en)

A cylindrical latch piece 6, 15 for an umbrella frame includes at least one stud 7 which clips into an aperture or notch 2 of the shaft once fully introduced to hold the latch piece securely to the shaft. At the bottom the latch piece has a shoulder 5 over which a detent 13 of the umbrella runner may locate to hold the umbrella frame fully extended. By this means a push-button-type runner can be used on, say, a metal frame. The latch piece can be either an additional part 15 or can itself constitute the upper section 6 of the shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236414 A2 20020904; EP 1236414 A3 20030326; CN 1287703 C 20061206; CN 1372861 A 20021009; GB 0104545 D0 20010411; HK 1049271 A1 20070727; TW 550058 B 20030901

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030927

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45B 25/00 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45B 25/08 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI