Global Patent Index - EP 1236429 A1

EP 1236429 A1 2002-09-04 - Structural assembly comprising a structural member and a finishing element for use with a water resistant floor covering

Title (en)

Structural assembly comprising a structural member and a finishing element for use with a water resistant floor covering

Title (de)

Bausatz mit einem Bauteil und einem Abschlussteil zur Verwendung mit einem wasserbeständigen Bodenbelag

Title (fr)

Kit comprenant un élément structurel et un élément de finition à utiliser avec un revêtement de sol résistant à l'eau

Publication

EP 1236429 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02250941 A

Priority

GB 0103972 A

Abstract (en)

A structure (14) in combination with a water resistant floor covering material (not shown), the structure (14) comprising a finishing element (10) which is locatable between an end (12a) of the structure (14) and the upper surface of the floor covering material and which can be shaped to fit or substantially fit a curvature or contour (28) of the in use floor covering material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/30; E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04F 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2013.01); E04F 15/02005 (2013.01); E04F 15/02188 (2013.01); E04F 19/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236429 A1 20020904; GB 0103972 D0 20010404; GB 2372267 A 20020821; GB 2372267 B 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-04-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURAL ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A STRUCTURAL MEMBER AND A FINISHING ELEMENT FOR USE WITH A WATER RESISTANT FLOOR COVERING

2004-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DLP LIMITED

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI