Global Patent Index - EP 1236453 A1

EP 1236453 A1 2002-09-04 - A CONTRACEPTIVE BAG FOR FEMALES

Title (en)

A CONTRACEPTIVE BAG FOR FEMALES

Title (de)

EMPFÄNGNISVERHÜTENDE TASCHE ZUM EINSETZEN IN DIE VAGINA

Title (fr)

POCHE CONTRACEPTIVE POUR FEMMES

Publication

EP 1236453 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00977391 A

Priority

  • CN 0000482 W
  • CN 99240418 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a contraceptive bag used in the superior part vagina and made of soft material. Said contraceptive bag comprises a fully enclosed top portion that can cover the cervix and an open bottom portion. At the bottom portion, the outside wall of the bag extends inwardly and forms some petal-liked walls of the bag. The petal-liked walls form a tube to receive the penis. Each petal-like wall has a curling side that is beneficial to store sperms. Both the outside wall and the petal-liked walls have some pleats to give better sexual feeling and prevent the flow of sperms. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 6/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 6/14 (2006.01); A61F 6/08 (2006.01); A61F 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 6/08 (2013.01); A61F 2006/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0137766 A1 20010531; AU 1512401 A 20010604; BR 0015925 A 20030715; CN 2396792 Y 20000920; DE 60011804 D1 20040729; DE 60011804 T2 20050714; EP 1236453 A1 20020904; EP 1236453 A4 20030205; EP 1236453 B1 20040623; EP 1236453 B9 20050112; JP 2003520071 A 20030702; MX PA02005194 A 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091122

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091122

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011804 P 20040729

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-02-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI