Global Patent Index - EP 1236485 A1

EP 1236485 A1 2002-09-04 - Draughtboard with removable playing squares and game kit comprising such a draughtboard

Title (en)

Draughtboard with removable playing squares and game kit comprising such a draughtboard

Title (de)

Damebrett mit entfernbaren Spielfeldern und Spielsatz aus einem solchen Damebrett

Title (fr)

Damier avec des cases de jeu amovibles et un kit de jeu comprenant un tel damier

Publication

EP 1236485 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02004491 A

Priority

IT TO20010032 U

Abstract (en)

A draughtboard (1) having a first and a second number of squares of different colours, and wherein the squares are defined by respective removable blocks (5, 6); the draughtboard (1) can be used for playing conventional draughts, or a variation draught game wherein the blocks (5, 6) can be changed to alter the normal alternating square arrangement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/02 (2006.01); A63F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/02 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00287 (2013.01); A63F 2003/0034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236485 A1 20020904; IT TO20010032 U1 20020828; IT TO20010032 V0 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040408

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030303

- Countries: LT

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030303

- Countries: LV

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030303

- Countries: RO

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030303

- Countries: SI

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI