Global Patent Index - EP 1236522 A2

EP 1236522 A2 2002-09-04 - Vertical rolling stand for use in a hot rolling mill line for the parallel-simultaneous production of rods or wires

Title (en)

Vertical rolling stand for use in a hot rolling mill line for the parallel-simultaneous production of rods or wires

Title (de)

Vertikales Walzgerüst für Heisswalzanlagen zur Parallel-Simultanerzeugung von Stangen oder Drähten

Title (fr)

Laminoir vertical pour un dispositif de laminage à chaud pour la fabrication parallèle-simultanée des tiges ou des fis

Publication

EP 1236522 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001551 A

Priority

IT PN20010010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002116804A1] A rolling system has a plant producing a plurality of continuously advancing and parallel hot metal strands, a vertical-roll stand receiving the strands, and a horizontal-roll stand. The vertical-roll stand has an upstream row of vertical pairs of rolls and, immediately downstream therefrom in a movement direction of the strands, a downstream row of vertical pairs or rolls with nips offset laterally from the nips of the upstream row. Every other strand passes by the upstream roll pairs and through the nips of the downstream roll pairs and the remaining strands pass through the nips of the upstream roll pairs and by the downstream roll pairs. The horizontal-roll stand is aligned with the vertical-roll stand and has a pair of horizontal rolls forming a plurality of nips aligned in the direction with the vertical-roll stand nips.

Abstract (de)

Vertikales Mehrfachdraht-Walzgerüst für Heißwalzanlagen zur Parallel-Simultanerzeugung einer Vielzahl von Stangen oder Drähten (b1, b2, ...bn) mit Vertikal- und Horizontalwalzmitteln zum fortlaufenden Heißwalzen derselben, wobei die besagten vertikalen Walzmittel eine Anzahl von vertikalen Walzrollenpaaren umfassen, die mindestens der Anzahl der besagten, mit zwei Reihen von versetzten Rollenpaaren zu walzenden Streifen/Stangen/Drähte entspricht; <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/46; B21B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/18 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 13/06 (2006.01); B21B 13/22 (2006.01); B21B 35/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 3/00 (2006.01); B21B 13/00 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 41/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/06 (2013.01); B21B 1/18 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01); B21B 35/04 (2013.01); B21B 1/08 (2013.01); B21B 1/0815 (2013.01); B21B 3/00 (2013.01); B21B 13/005 (2013.01); B21B 39/006 (2013.01); B21B 41/08 (2013.01); B21B 2013/003 (2013.01); B21B 2013/006 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0057 (2013.01); B21B 2203/22 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5184 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236522 A2 20020904; EP 1236522 A3 20021002; IT PN20010010 A1 20020816; JP 2002292401 A 20021008; US 2002116804 A1 20020829; US 6568056 B2 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041119

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030308

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 1/46 A, 7B 22D 11/04 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI