Global Patent Index - EP 1236539 A2

EP 1236539 A2 2002-09-04 - Honing method

Title (en)

Honing method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Honbearbeiten

Title (fr)

Procédé de rodage

Publication

EP 1236539 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004169 A

Priority

DE 10110200 A

Abstract (en)

To machine the surface of a drilling (3) tool to give hone tracks (5), it is worked by a spindle honing tool, with at least one forward stroke and one reverse stroke. The ratio of the stroke movement speed to the rotary speed of the tool (3) is increased over the normal spindle honing ratios. The ratio of the stroke speed to the rotary speed of the tool is increased when the tool movement is reversed.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Honbearbeitung schlägt vor, mit einem Dornhonwerkzeug entweder gleich oder im Anschluss an ein Dornhonen mit dem gleichen Werkzeug eine Nachbearbeitung durchzuführen, bei der das Verhältnis von Hubgeschwindigkeit zu Drehzahl des Werkzeugs deutlich erhöht wird. Dadurch wird eine Kreuzstruktur der Honspuren erreicht, die ein besseres Ölhaltevermögen zulässt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 33/02; B24B 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/02 (2013.01); B24B 19/028 (2013.01); Y10T 408/8588 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236539 A2 20020904; EP 1236539 A3 20030723; DE 10110200 A1 20020905; US 2002173236 A1 20021121; US 6793560 B2 20040921

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100901

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI