Global Patent Index - EP 1236540 A2

EP 1236540 A2 2002-09-04 - Wafer abrasive machine

Title (en)

Wafer abrasive machine

Title (de)

Halbleiterplatteschleifvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de polissage de plaquette semiconductrice

Publication

EP 1236540 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251319 A

Priority

JP 2001055177 A

Abstract (en)

In the wafer abrasive machine of the present invention, a gravity center and a rotational axis of a wafer (W) can be corresponded while abrading the wafer (W) and a holding plate (10) can be smoothly moved in a head member (24). The abrasive machine comprises: the head member (24) including a concave section (26), in which the holding plate (10) is accommodated; an elastic sheet member (38) suspending the holding plate (10), the elastic sheet member (38) being reinforced by a cloth-formed reinforcing member (41); a space (50) for storing pressure fluid which pushes the holding plate (10) toward the abrasive plate (20), the space (50) being formed between the elastic sheet member (38) and the concave section (26); and a plurality of spherical bodies (9) being provided between an outer face (10a) of the holding plate (10) and an inner face (24a) of the concave section (26), the spherical bodies (9) simultaneously point-contact the both circumferential faces (10a, 24a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/005 (2012.01); B24B 37/30 (2012.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236540 A2 20020904; EP 1236540 A3 20040128; EP 1236540 B1 20070912; DE 60222314 D1 20071025; DE 60222314 T2 20080605; JP 2002261056 A 20020913; JP 3294600 B1 20020624; KR 100841491 B1 20080625; KR 20020070136 A 20020905; TW 590845 B 20040611; US 2002119735 A1 20020829; US 6692342 B2 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222314 P 20071025

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI