Global Patent Index - EP 1236541 A2

EP 1236541 A2 2002-09-04 - Rotary tool for surface processing and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Rotary tool for surface processing and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Rotationswerkzeug für Oberflächenbearbeitung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Outil rotatif pour le traitement de surface et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1236541 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004455 A

Priority

DE 10110739 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a rotary tool (11), e.g. for the removal or polishing of vehicle paintwork, a holder (13) is initially mounted to a clamping rod (12), and the tool body (15) is pushed over the rod until the axial end side butts against the holder. A second holder (14) is pushed over the rod, to bear against the other end side, and compress the disks forming the tool body. The bottom holder is held in place in a press fit at the rod, with the tool body clamped between the holders.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Rotationswerkzeuges (11) für Oberflächenbearbeitung wird zunächst ein erstes Halteelement (13) einer Haltevorrichtung an einem Spannstift (12) befestigt. Der Werkzeugkörper (15) wird auf den Spannstift (12) aufgeschoben bis zur Anlage eines axialen Endes des Werkzeugkörpers (15) an dem ersten Halteelement (13). Ein zweites Halteelement (14) der Haltevorrichtung wird auf den Spannstift (12) aufgeschoben bis zu einer frei vorgebbaren Halteposition, in der das zweite Halteelement (14) in Eingriff mit dem anderen axialen Ende (16) des Werkzeugkörpers (15) steht. Ein zusammenpressbarer Werkzeugkörper (15), z.B. aus Schleifvlies-Scheiben kann dabei axial zusammengepresst werden. Zum Schluß des Herstellungsprozesses wird das zweite Halteelement (14) an dem Spannstift in seiner Halteposition fixiert, was bei bevorzugten Ausführungsformen dadurch erfolgt, dass das Halteelement (14) für einen Presssitz auf dem Spannstift (12) dimensioniert ist, so dass es selbsttätig am Spannstift (12) festhält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/08; B24D 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/08 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236541 A2 20020904; EP 1236541 A3 20031105; DE 10110739 A1 20020905; US 2003000062 A1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 13/08 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 13/20 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI