Global Patent Index - EP 1236542 A2

EP 1236542 A2 2002-09-04 - Hydraulic clamp

Title (en)

Hydraulic clamp

Title (de)

Hydraulische Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Tendeur hydraulique

Publication

EP 1236542 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450018 A

Priority

AT 2252001 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic clamping system, e.g. to clamp a workpiece at a machine tool, has a piston (4) at the clamping cylinder (5), with a smaller diameter rapid cylinder (16) at the end of the cylinder away from the clamp (6) with its piston (15). The clamping and rapid cylinders are supplied by parallel hydraulic lines (8,9) from the pressure supply (10). A change-over valve (18) in the hydraulic line to the clamping cylinder is opened when the rapid cylinder pressure reaches a given level on bearing against the clamp, to release the hydraulic flow into the clamping cylinder. An extraction valve (13) holds the extraction line (12) open to the pressure medium tank (14) until it closes automatically when the change-over valve opens. The hydraulic pressure pump (10) has small dimensions, to handle the low volume flows.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer hydraulischen Spannvorrichtung ist der Kolben (4) des Spannzylinders (5) auf der dem Spannelement (6) abgewandten Seite mit dem Kolben (15) eines im wirksamen Durchmesser kleineren Eilzylinders (16) in Verbindung. Spannzylinder (5) und Eilzylinder (16) sind über parallele Druckmittelleitungen (8, 9) mit der Druckmittelquelle (10) verbunden, wobei in der Druckmittelleitung (8, 9) zum Spannzylinder (5) einerseits ein Umschaltventil (18), welches bei Überschreitung eines das am Ende des Eilganges erfolgende Anliegen des Spannelementes (6) am zu spannenden Element charakterisierenden Druckniveaus selbsttätig die vorher gesperrte Druckmittelleitung (8) zum Spannzylinder (5) freigibt, und andererseits ein Nachsaugventil (13), welches eine Nachsaugverbindung (12) zum Druckmitteltank (14) offenhält und diese druckbedingt selbsttätig vor dem Öffnen des Umschaltventils (18) schließt, angeordnet ist. Auf diese Weise kann der erforderliche Volumenstrom und damit die Druckmittelpumpe (10) klein gehalten werden, was kleines Bauvolumen, geringe Leistungsaufnahme und eine kostengünstige Ausführung ermöglicht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 1/18 (2006.01); F15B 11/02 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/18 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/204 (2013.01); B25B 1/18 (2013.01); B25B 5/061 (2013.01); F15B 11/022 (2013.01); F15B 15/1409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236542 A2 20020904; EP 1236542 A3 20070606; AT 411034 B 20030925; AT A2252001 A 20030215

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 5/06 20060101AFI20020613BHEP

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F15B 15/18 20060101ALI20070420BHEP

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F15B 15/20 20060101ALI20070420BHEP

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 1/18 20060101ALN20070420BHEP

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI