Global Patent Index - EP 1236543 A2

EP 1236543 A2 2002-09-04 - Locking or expanding pliers

Title (en)

Locking or expanding pliers

Title (de)

Klemm- oder Spreizzange

Title (fr)

Pince étau ou pince extensible

Publication

EP 1236543 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004045 A

Priority

  • DE 19905594 A
  • DE 19933033 A
  • EP 00903630 A

Abstract (en)

The pliers have a toothed arc batten (11) fitted to one of the arms (4) of the pliers, in the teeth of which a locking pawl (13) fitted to the handle part of the other arm (6) engages. This pawl and its locking sector (17) are made in two parts. The spacing between the tooth engagement point of the pawl and the teeth and bearing journals can be reduced, causing the two clamping sectors (7, 9) to spring apart.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Klemm- oder Spreizzange mit zwei in der Art eines Scherengelenkes miteinander verbundenen Zangenarmen (4,5), die einendig Griffabschnitte (6,8) und anderendig bei Griffbetätigung aufeinander zu bewegbare Spannabschnitte (7,9) ausbilden, wobei die beiden Zangenarme (4,5) in verschiedenen Abstandslagen der Spannabschnitte (7,9) in Spannstellungen verrastbar sind, und erreicht einen von verwindenden Kräften weitestgehend freigehaltenen Gewerbebereich durch eine einem Zangenarm (4) zugeordnete Zahnbogenleiste(11), in deren Verzahnung (12) eine dem Griffabschnitt des anderen Zangenarmes (5) zugeordnete Sperrklinke (13) eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 7/00 (2006.01); B25B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2013.01); B25B 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6708587 B1 20040323; AT 222839 T 20020915; AU 2544400 A 20000829; CA 2327300 A1 20000817; CA 2327300 C 20010911; CA 2342760 A1 20000817; CA 2342760 C 20060627; CN 1327406 A 20011219; DE 20021888 U1 20010308; DE 50000415 D1 20021002; DE 50010058 D1 20050519; EP 1150804 A1 20011107; EP 1150804 B1 20020828; EP 1150804 B8 20030326; EP 1236543 A2 20020904; EP 1236543 A3 20021211; EP 1236543 B1 20050413; EP 1323499 A2 20030702; EP 1323499 A3 20031210; EP 1323499 B1 20091104; ES 2179017 T3 20030116; WO 0047371 A1 20000817; WO 0047371 A8 20020418

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090126

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010058 P 20050519

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1150804 P

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOCKING OR EXPANDING PLIERS

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040603

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1150804

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE