Global Patent Index - EP 1236545 A2

EP 1236545 A2 2002-09-04 - Power tool body

Title (en)

Power tool body

Title (de)

Gehäuse für kraftgetriebenes Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Carter d'outil à main motorisé

Publication

EP 1236545 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02004485 A

Priority

GB 0105140 A

Abstract (en)

A power drill/driver (6) is formed from a plurality of components. Two mirror-image body portions (2, 4) are brought together about a centre line and then a shrouding (34) is placed over the rear indented portion (28) of the composite tool (6). The tool so formed has greater structural rigidity than a tool formed from conventional clamshell or body halves without such a shrouding thereover. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02; B25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236545 A2 20020904; EP 1236545 A3 20050615; GB 0105140 D0 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25F 5/02 A

2005-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25F 5/00 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI