Global Patent Index - EP 1236547 A2

EP 1236547 A2 2002-09-04 - Shaving system which actively flex a blade

Title (en)

Shaving system which actively flex a blade

Title (de)

Rasiersystem welches eine Klinge aktiv biegt

Title (fr)

Système de rasage qui fléchit une lame activement

Publication

EP 1236547 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02003014 A

Priority

US 79613101 A

Abstract (en)

Wet shaving systems having a flexible blade housing which is linked to a support by a linkage (40) comprising a plurality of links which actively flex the blade (20), i.e., cause portions of the blade edge to move upwardly in response to shaving forces exerted downwardly on other portions of blade. This shaving system redistributes shaving forces along the cutting edge (22) of the blade. In illustrated embodiments, the blade housing is linked to a razor by two four-bar linkages which are either overlapping or separate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/14 (2006.01); B26B 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236547 A2 20020904; EP 1236547 A3 20030402; AU 1868302 A 20020829; CA 2373204 A1 20020828; JP 2002306870 A 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26B 21/16 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26B 21/22 B

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI