Global Patent Index - EP 1236551 A1

EP 1236551 A1 2002-09-04 - Device for cutting up bundled wood pieces

Title (en)

Device for cutting up bundled wood pieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ablängen von gebündelten Holzstücken zu Stückholz

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour couper des pièces de bois groupées en faisceau

Publication

EP 1236551 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105090 A

Priority

EP 01105090 A

Abstract (en)

Process for cutting bundles of pieces (1) of wood removably held together by a holding device (4) into lumps (2) of wood comprises at least one saw device (5) attached to the holding device and pressed onto the pieces of wood and rotated perpendicular to their longitudinal extension. An Independent claim is also included for a device for cutting bundles of pieces of wood into lumps of wood. Preferred Features: The bundles of wood are held by a holding device before or during the rotating movement. After cutting the holding device is released, moved along the pieces of wood parallel to their longitudinal extension by a distance corresponding to the length of the lumps of wood, and retightened.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem erfindungsgemässen Ablängen von gebündelten Holzstücken (1), z. B. eines Sterbündels (3), zu Stückholz (2) werden die gebündelten Holzstücke (1) als ganzes von einer Festhalteeinrichtung (4) lösbar umgreifend festgehalten. Eine an der Festhalteeinrichtung (4) erfindungsgemäss angebrachte Sägeeinrichtung (5) wird senkrecht zur Längserstreckung der gebündelten Holzstücke (1) gegen diese geschwenkt, an diese angedrückt, und alle gebündelten Holzstücke (1) werden zu Stückholz (2) abgelängt. Weiterbildungen der Erfindung umfassen die Ausbildung der Festhalteeinrichtung (7) in Form zweier auf- bzw. zuklappbarer Greifschalen (13, 14) zum Aufgreifen liegender Sterbündel (3), die Intergration einer Vorschubeinrichtung (11, 9), die Ausrüstung der antreibenden Komponenten mit hydraulischen Antrieben und/oder deren elektronische oder hydraulische Steuerung bzw. Regelung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 1/00; B27B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 1/00 (2006.01); B27B 17/00 (2006.01); B27B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 1/002 (2013.01); B27B 17/0058 (2013.01); B27B 17/0091 (2013.01); B27B 29/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0897867 A1 19990224 - IBW INGENIEUR BUERO WEISS [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236551 A1 20020904; EP 1236551 B1 20071024; AT 376484 T 20071115; AT 421412 T 20090215; DE 50113167 D1 20071206; DE 50114682 D1 20090312; EP 1810800 A1 20070725; EP 1810800 B1 20090121

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113167

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113167 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANDROCK GMBH

2007-05-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR CUTTING UP BUNDLED WOOD PIECES

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAECHLE, SIMON

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI