Global Patent Index - EP 1236552 A1

EP 1236552 A1 2002-09-04 - Method and plant for the production of fiberboards

Title (en)

Method and plant for the production of fiberboards

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von Holzwerkstoffplatten

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de panneaux en fibres lignocellulosiques

Publication

EP 1236552 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003478 A

Priority

DE 10106815 A

Abstract (en)

In a process to manufacture chipboard, a continual fed of wood chips or fibre is scattered with a small quantity of a bonding agent (or no bonding agent) onto a non-corroding endless metal belt as this advances through a press. The wood fibre and bonding agent are pressed and heated into a fibreboard. Also claimed is a chipboard or fibreboard manufacturing press assembly with a particle scatter station over a conveyer belt feeding a press. The scatter station may feed one or more layers simultaneously. The press has a moving upper frame and a stationery lower frame with heating and cooling press plates. In the process the mixture of chips and bonding agent are dried to bring moisture content to the range 16 to 25 per cent and scattered onto the belt, where application of saturated steam and hot water spray raises the humidity to the range 25 to 35 per cent immediately prior to entering the press. The moistened chip matrix passes into the press where, during 20 per cent of the press travel, it is compressed to a maximum of 5.5 N/mm2. Water is expelled and the matrix dries under core pressure of no more than 1 N/mm2, until core moisture content falls to 5-8 per cent. In the final hardening phase the board is subjected to a maximum pressure of 3.5 N/mm2 and compressed to final dimensions and dried until the core moisture falls to 2 per cent.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Holzwerkstoffplatten, wie Span- und Faserplatten, insbesondere von Faserplatten aus Holz oder anderen lignozellulosehaltigen Materialien, bei dem aus einer Streustation auf ein sich kontinuierlich bewegendes Transportband eine mit niedrigem oder ohne Klebstoffanteil versetzte Fasermatte gebildet wird, die nach Ablage auf ein Metallgewebeband zwischen die Pressplatten einer Presse eingeführt und darin unter Anwendung von Druck und Wärme zu einer Faserplatte verpresst und ausgehärtet wird, wobei die Anlage eine Streustation, ein unter der Streustation sich kontinuierlich bewegtes Transportband und eine Presse beinhaltet, wobei aus der Streustation eine ein- oder mehrschichtige Fasermatte streubar ist, die Presse aus einem beweglichen Rahmenoberteil und einem stationären Rahmenunterteil und daran angebrachten heiz- und kühlbaren Pressplatten besteht, zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/24 (2006.01); B30B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 5/067 (2013.01); B27N 3/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236552 A1 20020904; EP 1236552 B1 20100421; AT 464987 T 20100515; DE 10106815 A1 20020829; DE 50214380 D1 20100602

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214380

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214380

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130402

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110214

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110214

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH + CO. KG, 75031 EPPINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50214380

- Effective date: 20121116

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214380

- Representative's name: HARTDEGEN, ANTON, DIPL.-ING.(FH), DE

- Effective date: 20121116

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 464987 T

- Effective date: 20110214

2012-11-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214380

- Representative's name: ANTON HARTDEGEN, DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110214

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER G.M.B.H. + CO. KG

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100823

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100722

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-11-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-08-04 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214380 P 20100602

2010-05-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2010-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070329

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH + CO. KG

2004-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEFFENBACHER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI