Global Patent Index - EP 1236553 A1

EP 1236553 A1 2002-09-04 - Core drill

Title (en)

Core drill

Title (de)

Hohlbohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Trépan carottier

Publication

EP 1236553 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01401641 A

Priority

KR 20010008264 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002112895A1] The present invention relates to a core drill wherein initial drilling workability is improved through reduced frictional resistance on the segment tips, when they are seated on the surface of an article to start cutting operation, and wherein cutting scraps or sludge produced by the segment tips are smoothly discharged through the helical grooves formed on the core body so as to reduce the friction between the core body and the cutting scraps or sludge, whereby both the cooling and cutting performance of the core drill are improved. The invention proposes a core drill with a cylindrical core body with a predetermined diameter and length and with plural cutting segments provided on the lower part of a core body at a finite interval, wherein the cutting thickness surface of the cutting segment consists of inclined sharp thickness portion for decreased frictional resistance with an article to be processed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 51/04 (2006.01); B28D 1/04 (2006.01); B28D 1/14 (2006.01); E21B 10/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/041 (2013.01); Y10T 408/81 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236553 A1 20020904; EP 1236553 B1 20081231; DE 60137190 D1 20090212; JP 2002239823 A 20020828; JP 3603052 B2 20041215; KR 100440871 B1 20040719; KR 20020067856 A 20020824; US 2002112895 A1 20020822; US 6564887 B2 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180605

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-12-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60137190 P 20090212

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051102

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010709

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI