Global Patent Index - EP 1236581 A1

EP 1236581 A1 2002-09-04 - Mechanism for adjusting tension of an inked ribbon of a printer

Title (en)

Mechanism for adjusting tension of an inked ribbon of a printer

Title (de)

Spannungseinstellvorrichtung für ein Farbband in einem Drucker

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tension pour ruban encreur dans une imprimante

Publication

EP 1236581 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01309165 A

Priority

JP 2001056383 A

Abstract (en)

A ribbon winding side ribbon and a ribbon supply side ribbon holder (13) are provided for supplying an inked ribbon (12) to a thermal printer. A ribbon tension detection plate (17,28) is rotatably supported on a frame so as to be rotated in dependency on tension of the inked ribbon. A ribbon tension adjusting means is provided to be responsive to angular position of the ribbon tension detecting plate for applying a load on the ribbon holder so that the tension of the inked ribbon is adjusted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/52 (2006.01); B41J 17/02 (2006.01); B41J 31/00 (2006.01); B41J 33/14 (2006.01); B41J 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/14 (2013.01); B41J 35/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0789172 A 19950404 - NEC CORP

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236581 A1 20020904; EP 1236581 B1 20081203; CN 1212235 C 20050727; CN 1374199 A 20021016; DE 60136789 D1 20090115; GB 0125422 D0 20011212; GB 2372724 A8 20050803; GB 2372724 A 20020904; GB 2372724 B 20050316; JP 2002254782 A 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CITIZEN WATCH CO., LTD., JP

- Effective date: 20170623

2017-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CITIZEN WATCH CO., LTD., NISHITOKYO-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60136789

2017-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136789

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2017-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136789

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136789

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136789

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60136789

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2009-11-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136789 P 20090115

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD.

2007-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070806

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI