Global Patent Index - EP 1236586 A2

EP 1236586 A2 2002-09-04 - Bicycle rim

Title (en)

Bicycle rim

Title (de)

Fahrradfelge

Title (fr)

Jante de bicyclette

Publication

EP 1236586 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01130672 A

Priority

US 79397301 A

Abstract (en)

A hollow bicycle rim 24 includes a pair of side portions 50, an outer portion 52 and a spoke attachment portion 54 with a plurality of spoke openings 76. The side portions 50 have ribs 51a to form opposing tire supporting surfaces 60b. The outer portion 52 extends between the side portions 50. The outer portion 52 includes a pair of annular inclined surfaces 62b extending radially inwardly from the side portions 50 with a curved connecting surface 62d extending therebetween. The spoke attachment portion 54 is rigidly coupled with the side portions 50 and the outer portion 52. The inclined surfaces 62b are preferably angled between three degrees and seventeen degrees. The outer annular portion 52 preferably has at least one aperture, but fewer than half of the number of spoke openings 76. The side portions 50 preferably have a pair of inner bent sections. A pair of spoke attachment sections 66 with the plurality of circumferentially arranged spoke openings 76 preferably have radial lengths larger than the spoke openings 76. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60B 1/04 (2006.01); B60B 21/06 (2006.01); B60B 1/14 (2006.01); B60B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60B 1/041 (2013.01); B60B 1/042 (2013.01); B60B 21/025 (2013.01); B60B 21/026 (2013.01); B60B 21/04 (2013.01); B60B 21/062 (2013.01); B60B 21/066 (2013.01); B60B 21/068 (2013.01); B60B 21/102 (2013.01); B60B 21/104 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 6126243 A 20001003 - OKAJIMA SHINPEI [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236586 A2 20020904; EP 1236586 A3 20040414; EP 1236586 B1 20070207; CN 1184087 C 20050112; CN 1373056 A 20021009; CZ 20020679 A3 20021016; DE 60126475 D1 20070322; DE 60126475 T2 20071129; JP 2002321501 A 20021105; JP 3686043 B2 20050824; TW 552205 B 20030911; US 6568766 B1 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070928

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2008-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-09-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60126475 P 20070322

2007-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2007-02-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070207

2006-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60B 21/06 20060101AFI20060703BHEP

2006-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60B 21/02 20060101ALI20060703BHEP

2006-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60B 1/04 20060101ALI20060703BHEP

2006-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60B 1/14 20060101ALI20060703BHEP

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHIMANO INC.

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050103

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI