Global Patent Index - EP 1236600 A2

EP 1236600 A2 2002-09-04 - Openable vehicle roof with two transparent panels

Title (en)

Openable vehicle roof with two transparent panels

Title (de)

Öffnungsfähiges Fahrzeugdach mit zwei transparenten Deckeln

Title (fr)

Toit ouvrant pour véhicule avec deux panneaux transparents

Publication

EP 1236600 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003102 A

Priority

DE 10110013 A

Abstract (en)

The car sun roof consists of two transparent opening sections (10, 12). These have covers (15, 21) mounted on rollers (18, 24) under them which can be adjusted to cover part or all of the openings above them. Each of the opening sections and the cover below it are adjusted by a common drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein öffnungsfähiges Fahrzeugdach, das mit einem ersten (10) und einem zweiten transparenten Deckel (12) versehen ist, die in Schließstellung jeweils eine Dachöffnung verschließen und verstellbar sind, um die Dachöffnung mindestens zum Teil freizugeben, wobei unterhalb des ersten Dekkels eine erste (15) und unterhalb des zweiten Deckels eine zweite Abdeckeinrichtung (21) vorgesehen sind, die verstellbar sind, um die Sicht aus dem Fahrzeuginnenraum (28) auf den jeweiligen Deckel bzw. die Dachöffnung zu verdekken oder mindestens zum Teil freizugeben. Für das Verstellen des ersten Dekkels (10) und mindestens teilweise Verstellen der ersten Abdeckeinrichtung (15) ist ein gemeinsamer erster Antrieb (30, 32) sowie für das Verstellen des zweiten Deckels (12) und mindestens teilweise Verstellen der zweiten Abdeckeinrichtung (21) ist ein gemeinsamer zweiter Antrieb (34, 36, 38, 40) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60J 7/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1236600 A2 20020904; EP 1236600 A3 20030102; AU 1546302 A 20020905; DE 10110013 A1 20020919; DE 10110013 C2 20030626; US 2002145310 A1 20021010; US 2004080189 A1 20040429

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI